TN HB0675 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-20 - Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-20 - Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a court to waive the home study required for adoption if the child has already resided in the adoptive parent's home for six consecutive months pursuant to a court order and the adoption is in the best interest of the child. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36 and Title 37, relative to adoption.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0445 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee