TN HB0667 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 429
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 429
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state after January 1, 2018; schedules the Tennessee Board of Funeral Directors and Embalmers Rule 0660-11-.05, relative to professional conduct, and filed in the office of secretary of state on December 12, 2018, to expire on May 21, 2019; specifies that, effective July 1, 2019, the department of revenue is no longer prohibited from collecting internet sales or use taxes pursuant to Rule 1320-05-01-.129(2). - Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state after January 1, 2018; schedules the Tennessee Board of Funeral Directors and Embalmers Rule 0660-11-.05, relative to professional conduct, and filed in the office of secretary of state on December 12, 2018, to expire on May 21, 2019; specifies that, effective July 1, 2019, the department of revenue is no longer prohibited from collecting internet sales or use taxes pursuant to Rule 1320-05-01-.129(2). - Title 4, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 429 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2019; 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0368) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 7, PNV 2 |
2019-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0422) |
2019-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/16/2019 |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0165 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 429