TN HB0667 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires commissioner of revenue to develop alternate audit procedures for licensed publicly traded companies subject to 15 percent gross receipts tax on sales of alcoholic beverages for on premises consumption. - Amends TCA Title 57 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, requires commissioner of revenue to develop alternate audit procedures for licensed publicly traded companies subject to 15 percent gross receipts tax on sales of alcoholic beverages for on premises consumption. - Amends TCA Title 57 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State Government Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-27 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/13/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/13/2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2013-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0720 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-14 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.