TN HB0657 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds Desert Storm, Operation Enduring Freedom, and Operation Iraqi Freedom to the definition of "period of armed conflict" for purposes of determining military service credit in the Tennessee consolidated retirement system. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35 and Title 8, Chapter 36.
Title
As introduced, adds Desert Storm, Operation Enduring Freedom, and Operation Iraqi Freedom to the definition of "period of armed conflict" for purposes of determining military service credit in the Tennessee consolidated retirement system. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35 and Title 8, Chapter 36.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0722 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0657&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0657.pdf |