TN HB0655 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Failed in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Failed in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the minimum total project cost amount for which a license as a contractor is required from $25,000 to $40,928; ties the minimum total project cost amount to the United States Bureau of Labor Statistics’ Producer Price Index by Industry: Building Materials and Supplies Dealers; requires the board for licensing contractors to update the amount at least annually and publish the amount on its public website. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 62, Chapter 6, relative to contractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | Failed in Commerce Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2024-02-01 | House | Sponsor change. |
2024-01-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-28 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee to 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee to 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/14/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1444 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0