TN HB0655 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the filing requirement for municipal and utility district travel and expense reimbursement policies, and any amendments to the policies, and instead requires the policies and amendments be made available for review and audit by the comptroller or the comptroller's designee. - Amends TCA Section 6-54-903 and Section 7-82-309.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 6-54-903 and Section 7-82-309, relative to travel and expense reimbursement policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 127 | |
2021-03-29 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0537 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2021