TN HB0644 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a state agency in any proceeding to suspend, terminate, or discipline an employee in state service to prove by a preponderance of the evidence that the employee violated state law or a rule or policy of the agency prior to taking such action. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 30; Title 9; Title 10 and Title 12.
Title
As introduced, requires a state agency in any proceeding to suspend, terminate, or discipline an employee in state service to prove by a preponderance of the evidence that the employee violated state law or a rule or policy of the agency prior to taking such action. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 30; Title 9; Title 10 and Title 12.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - HOUSE STATE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Held on desk. |
2020-02-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/20/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/13/2020 |
2019-04-11 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0621 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020