TN HB0640 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits governmental animal control agencies operating in counties having poulation of less than 300,000 to utilize veterinarian on case by case basis rather than employing veterinarian full-time in complying with statutory requirements for using chemical capture of animals. - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 17, Part 6 and Title 63, Chapter 12.
Title
As introduced, permits governmental animal control agencies operating in counties having poulation of less than 300,000 to utilize veterinarian on case by case basis rather than employing veterinarian full-time in complying with statutory requirements for using chemical capture of animals. - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 17, Part 6 and Title 63, Chapter 12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/13/2013 |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2013-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0784 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-26 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. H&W Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0640&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0640.pdf |