TN HB0626 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires certain state agencies to seek funding for the development of substance use disorder recovery programs for pregnant women and women with children; requires those agencies to annually report to the general assembly certain information about the recovery programs and funding. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 33; Title 37; Title 49; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 33; Title 37; Title 49; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to substance use disorder.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 197 | |
2021-04-05 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0574 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021