TN HB0610 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a credit against premium taxes in the amount of the charges, expenses, and fees paid by insurance companies for certain examinations performed by the commissioner of commerce and insurance. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 56, Chapter 4, Part 2, relative to a premium tax credit for examination charges, fees, and expenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-10-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/8/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0120 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024