TN HB0606 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 511
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 511
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "James Lee Atwood Jr. Law," which establishes an electronic insurance verification program. - Amends TCA Title 4; Section 9-4-603; Title 10; Title 12; Title 55, Chapter 12; Title 55, Chapter 4; Title 55, Chapter 10 and Title 56.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "James Lee Atwood Jr. Law," which establishes an electronic insurance verification program. - Amends TCA Title 4; Section 9-4-603; Title 10; Title 12; Title 55, Chapter 12; Title 55, Chapter 4; Title 55, Chapter 10 and Title 56.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO LIMIT DEBATE AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 50 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 60 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO LIMIT DEBATE AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 50 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 60 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 511 | |
2015-06-03 | Effective date(s) 05/20/2015; 07/01/2015; 01/01/2016 | |
2015-05-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-05-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 2, PNV 2 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA0416) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0327) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0169) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-04-17 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-04-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 63, Nays 25, PNV 4 |
2015-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0443) |
2015-04-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0442) |
2015-04-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0129) |
2015-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/11/2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee--Government Operations for review |
2015-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0648 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 511