TN HB0595 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 215
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 215
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that the definition section of the Tennessee Condominium Act of 2008 applies only to the extent necessary in construing any of the sections relevant to such act. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 27, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that the definition section of the Tennessee Condominium Act of 2008 applies only to the extent necessary in construing any of the sections relevant to such act. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 27, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 215 | |
2009-05-04 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/4/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/30/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Action Def. in Commerce Committee to 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in Commerce Committee to 4/21/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Action Def. in Commerce Committee to 4/14/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-03-17 | Action Def. in Commerce Committee to 3/31/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 03/17/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Action Def. in Commerce Committee to 3/17/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 03/10/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 03/04/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Industrial Impact of COM | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to Commerce | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0922 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 215
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0595&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0595.pdf |