TN HB0591 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Pub. Ch. 440
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Pub. Ch. 440
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, redefines "electronic communication" and "wire communication" for certain wiretapping and electronic surveillance offenses. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As enacted, redefines "electronic communication" and "wire communication" for certain wiretapping and electronic surveillance offenses. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-27 - House - CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar (1) (Y: 9 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-27 - House - CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar (1) (Y: 9 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | Pub. Ch. 440 | |
2009-06-30 | Effective date(s) 07/01/09 | |
2009-06-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-12 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-06-11 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-10 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-09 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-06-08 | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-08 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-06-08 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-06-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-06-04 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 3 | |
2009-06-04 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0522) | |
2009-06-02 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/4/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Failed In: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-05-13 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0782 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 440