TN HB0581 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee of Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee of Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows individuals to be exempt from the workers' compensation requirements if such individual is a member of a recognized religious sect or division and is an adherent of established tenets or teachings of such sect or division by reason of which such individual is conscientiously opposed to acceptance of the benefits provided by the workers' compensation laws. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, allows individuals to be exempt from the workers' compensation requirements if such individual is a member of a recognized religious sect or division and is an adherent of established tenets or teachings of such sect or division by reason of which such individual is conscientiously opposed to acceptance of the benefits provided by the workers' compensation laws. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee of Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 4/6/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of C&EA | |
2011-02-16 | P2C, ref. to Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee--Government Operations for review | |
2011-02-14 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1839 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0581&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0581.pdf |