TN HB0539 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Failed for Lack of Second in: Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Failed for Lack of Second in: Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes requirement that a majority of eligible LEA employees vote to accept insurance plan before adoption by the LEA; requires local education insurance committee to provide claims data to prospective insurers. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 27; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, removes requirement that a majority of eligible LEA employees vote to accept insurance plan before adoption by the LEA; requires local education insurance committee to provide claims data to prospective insurers. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 27; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Failed for Lack of Second in: Education Subcommittee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2013-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0989 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0539&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0539.pdf |