TN HB0509 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Pub. Ch. 510
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Pub. Ch. 510
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises certain provisions regarding child abuse; revises certain provisions regarding detention of juveniles. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
As enacted, revises certain provisions regarding child abuse; revises certain provisions regarding detention of juveniles. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 36 and Title 37.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Pub. Ch. 510 | |
2019-06-06 | Effective date(s) 06/03/2019; 07/01/2019 | |
2019-06-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-09 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-05-02 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-05-01 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/2/19 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (Haile, Stevens, Bell) |
2019-05-01 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. (Littleton, Lamberth, DeBerry) |
2019-05-01 | House | H. refused to recede from am. no. 3 HB0509 |
2019-05-01 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 3 for 5/1/19 |
2019-05-01 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 3 HB0509 |
2019-04-30 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (SA #3 - SA0440) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0413) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0276) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-29 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 1, PNV 3 |
2019-04-29 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0341) |
2019-04-29 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 5 - HA0495) |
2019-04-29 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA0477) |
2019-04-29 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0476) |
2019-04-29 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0333) |
2019-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/29/19 |
2019-04-24 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2019-04-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee |
2019-03-27 | House | Ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0209 (Crossfiled) 2019-06-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 510