TN HB0500 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires counties receiving correctional incentive subsidies to submit an accounting of such expenditures to the commissioner; if the facility has not been certified pursuant to state jail standards, prohibits grant of future subsidies unless required expenditures are made; authorizes the commissioner to reimburse counties for actual improvement expenditures. - Amends TCA Title 41.
Title
As introduced, requires counties receiving correctional incentive subsidies to submit an accounting of such expenditures to the commissioner; if the facility has not been certified pursuant to state jail standards, prohibits grant of future subsidies unless required expenditures are made; authorizes the commissioner to reimburse counties for actual improvement expenditures. - Amends TCA Title 41.
Sponsors
Rep. Curry Todd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 4/22/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-03-17 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0167 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0500&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0500.pdf |