TN HB0498 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 66-24)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, reduces the time period from 30 days to 15 days for an enrollee or applicant for medical assistance to mail documentation of a material change affecting the enrollee or applicant's TennCare application. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, reduces the time period from 30 days to 15 days for an enrollee or applicant for medical assistance to mail documentation of a material change affecting the enrollee or applicant's TennCare application. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors

Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Timothy Hill [R]
Rep. Robin Smith [R]Rep. Matthew Hill [R]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]
Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]Rep. Martin Daniel [R]
Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]
Rep. James Van Huss [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]Rep. Rick Staples [D]
Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]
Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. John Clemmons [D]
Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Jason Potts [D]Rep. Bill Beck [D]
Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]
Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]
Rep. Jason Zachary [R]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]
Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Jim Coley [R]
Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]
Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. London Lamar [D]Rep. Karen Camper [D]
Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]
Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. G Hardaway [D]
Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]
Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]
Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. John Ragan [R]
Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]
Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-14SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-08HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-05-01SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-05-01SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0445)
2019-05-01SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0174)
2019-05-01SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-05-01SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-30HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-30HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-30HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0500)
2019-04-30HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0147)
2019-04-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced behind the budget
2019-04-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/10/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-26HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-20HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseAction Def. in s/c TennCare Subcommittee to 3/20/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-27HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c TennCare Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-06HouseAssigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-01HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0476 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback