TN HB0498 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-19)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, reduces the time period from 30 days to 15 days for an enrollee or applicant for medical assistance to mail documentation of a material change affecting the enrollee or applicant's TennCare application. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, reduces the time period from 30 days to 15 days for an enrollee or applicant for medical assistance to mail documentation of a material change affecting the enrollee or applicant's TennCare application. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced behind the budget
2019-04-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/10/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-26HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-20HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseAction Def. in s/c TennCare Subcommittee to 3/20/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-27HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c TennCare Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-06HouseAssigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-01HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0476 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-18 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback