TN SB0476 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, reduces the time period from 30 days to 15 days for an enrollee or applicant for medical assistance to mail documentation of a material change affecting the enrollee or applicant's TennCare application. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, reduces the time period from 30 days to 15 days for an enrollee or applicant for medical assistance to mail documentation of a material change affecting the enrollee or applicant's TennCare application. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-03-26SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0498 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback