TN HB0494 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-10 - Assigned to s/c Consumer Affairs of C&EA
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-10 - Assigned to s/c Consumer Affairs of C&EA
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a rebuttable presumption that price-gouging has been committed if there has been an immediate price increase of 25 percent or more for any consumer item; provides that the penalty for price-gouging may include a fine that is three times the amount of gross profits. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 51.
Title
As introduced, creates a rebuttable presumption that price-gouging has been committed if there has been an immediate price increase of 25 percent or more for any consumer item; provides that the penalty for price-gouging may include a fine that is three times the amount of gross profits. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 51.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-10 | Assigned to s/c Consumer Affairs of C&EA | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to Consumer & Employee Affairs | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0098 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-14 - Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 4/21/2010
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0494&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0494.pdf |