TN HB0492 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, accelerates the sunset termination date for the Tennessee massage licensure board from June 30, 2022 to June 30, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 18.
Title
As introduced, accelerates the sunset termination date for the Tennessee massage licensure board from June 30, 2022 to June 30, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 18.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0161 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Failed in Senate Government Operations Committee / no motion