TN HB0486 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires political campaign committees to report contributions and expenditures for a local election to the registry of election finance rather than to the local county election commission; requires complaints on statements of local political campaign committees to be filed in the office of the registry of election finance rather than with the local district attorney. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 10, relative to campaign finance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2023 | |
2023-03-28 | Pub. Ch. 59 | |
2023-03-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-03-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-03-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-03-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/23/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/16/2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/14/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/8/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0865 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 59