TN HB0484 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 440
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 440
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Uniform Limited Partnership Act of 2017." - Amends TCA Title 61.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Uniform Limited Partnership Act of 2017." - Amends TCA Title 61.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Travis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 440 | |
2017-05-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-05-09 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Action def. in Business and Utilities Committee to 3/22/17 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0438 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-30 - Pub. Ch. 440