TN HB0471 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes social security number from the information that a funeral establishment must include on the permanent identification device attached to a dead human body prior to interment and from the permanent identification device placed in the crematory urn before the remains are placed in the urn.
Title
As enacted, removes social security number from the information that a funeral establishment must include on the permanent identification device attached to a dead human body prior to interment and from the permanent identification device placed in the crematory urn before the remains are placed in the urn.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 139 | |
2017-04-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-03-30 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0428 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 139