TN HB0468 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes issuance of hummingbird awareness new specialty earmarked plate; allocates 50 percent of funds produced from sale thereof to wildlife resources fund. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 54; Title 55; Title 65 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, authorizes issuance of hummingbird awareness new specialty earmarked plate; allocates 50 percent of funds produced from sale thereof to wildlife resources fund. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 54; Title 55; Title 65 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Sponsor change. |
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2013-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0656 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0468&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0468.pdf |