TN HB0465 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to use a hair follicle test when testing a child for the presence of a controlled substance in the child's body. - Amends TCA Title 24; Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 24; Title 36 and Title 37, relative to drug testing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0589 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee