TN HB0456 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date(s) 03/28/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date(s) 03/28/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a political subdivision, or an instrumentality of a political subdivision with at least 1,000 employees, to implement, adopt, or administer an automatic deferred or tax-sheltered compensation plan for employees. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 50, relative to retirement plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Effective date(s) 03/28/2022 | |
2022-03-30 | Pub. Ch. 676 | |
2022-03-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-03-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-16 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1473 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 676