TN HB0442 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes 12 workweeks of paid family leave during a 12-month period for qualified state employees. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 8, relative to paid family leave.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0227 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-21 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0442&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/HB0442.pdf |