TN HB0436 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from October 1 to March 30, the date by which the Tennessee student assistance corporation and the Tennessee higher education commission must report the findings of its research and analysis of data concerning the Tennessee Promise scholarship program to the education committee of the senate and the education committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to financial aid.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0330 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee