TN HB0413 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 438
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates a task force to study the issues created by the maintenance of certification process for Tennessee physicians; prohibits board of medical examiners and board of osteopathic examination from taking certain action on a license based on nonparticipation in any form of maintenance of licensure. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 56, Chapter 7; Title 63, Chapter 6; Title 63, Chapter 9 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates a task force to study the issues created by the maintenance of certification process for Tennessee physicians; prohibits board of medical examiners and board of osteopathic examination from taking certain action on a license based on nonparticipation in any form of maintenance of licensure. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 56, Chapter 7; Title 63, Chapter 6; Title 63, Chapter 9 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 438
2017-05-09HouseComp. SB subst.
2017-05-09HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 5/9/2017
2017-05-09HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/9/2017
2017-05-09HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-05-08HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/8/2017
2017-05-08HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
2017-05-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
2017-05-01HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-04-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Study Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means for 5/1/2017
2017-04-19HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Study Subcommittee
2017-04-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017
2017-04-12HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-04-11HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-04-10HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-06HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/11/2017
2017-04-05HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
2017-03-29HouseAction Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/5/2017
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-22HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
2017-03-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-20HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-14HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-09HouseSponsor change.
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2017-02-08HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2017-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-02HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0298 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-30 - Pub. Ch. 438

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback