TN SB0298 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Pub. Ch. 438
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates a task force to study the issues created by the maintenance of certification process for Tennessee physicians; prohibits board of medical examiners and board of osteopathic examination from taking certain action on a license based on nonparticipation in any form of maintenance of licensure. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 56, Chapter 7; Title 63, Chapter 6; Title 63, Chapter 9 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates a task force to study the issues created by the maintenance of certification process for Tennessee physicians; prohibits board of medical examiners and board of osteopathic examination from taking certain action on a license based on nonparticipation in any form of maintenance of licensure. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 56, Chapter 7; Title 63, Chapter 6; Title 63, Chapter 9 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30 Pub. Ch. 438
2017-05-30 Effective date(s) 05/25/2017
2017-05-25SenateSigned by Governor.
2017-05-22SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2017-05-18HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-05-17SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-05-11SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2017-05-10SenateConcurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0648)
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 5/10/2017
2017-05-09HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
2017-05-09HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0648)
2017-05-09HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0361)
2017-05-09HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2017-04-19HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2017-04-17SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2017-04-17SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-17SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2017-04-17SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0296)
2017-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2017
2017-04-04SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2017-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
2017-04-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017
2017-03-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017
2017-03-28SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017
2017-03-21SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/28/2017
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/21/2017
2017-03-14SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-09SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-15SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2017-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0413 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 438

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback