TN HB0400 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from three years to four years the amount of time that an operator of a hotel has to maintain records for purposes of determining hotel occupancy taxes owed. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 56; Title 57; Title 62; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, increases from three years to four years the amount of time that an operator of a hotel has to maintain records for purposes of determining hotel occupancy taxes owed. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 56; Title 57; Title 62; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1072 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee