TN HB0400 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Def. to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Def. to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows for electronic testimony in criminal trials where the court finds that the defendant and witness can view and hear each other, the judge and jury are able to observe the witness, and there is good cause for allowing the testimony to be given by electronic means. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, allows for electronic testimony in criminal trials where the court finds that the defendant and witness can view and hear each other, the judge and jury are able to observe the witness, and there is good cause for allowing the testimony to be given by electronic means. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | House | Def. to Summer Study |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/6/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/6/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/30/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/3/2016 |
2015-04-14 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 2016 |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/7/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 4/7/2015 |
2015-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-24 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/11/2015 |
2015-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee--Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1277 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0400&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0400.pdf |