TN HB0396 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of health to develop and implement a program to provide colorectal cancer screenings for uninsured individuals between ages 50 and 64 and for any other uninsured individuals determined to be at high risk for developing colon cancer; requires health insurance companies to cover colorectal cancer screenings. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of health to develop and implement a program to provide colorectal cancer screenings for uninsured individuals between ages 50 and 64 and for any other uninsured individuals determined to be at high risk for developing colon cancer; requires health insurance companies to cover colorectal cancer screenings. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 2012 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Action def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 4/28/2010 Mtg. canceled | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/21/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 4/21/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 4/14/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to Mandate calendar | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 02/24/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 2/24/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 02/10/2010 | |
2009-04-15 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 2010 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to mandate calendar | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Industrial Impact of COM | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to Commerce | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0508 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-30 - Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0396&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0396.pdf |