TN HB0392 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands murder in the first degree to include the killing of another while committing domestic abuse, when the perpetrator has a history of domestic abuse and the death occurs with extreme indifference to human life. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, expands murder in the first degree to include the killing of another while committing domestic abuse, when the perpetrator has a history of domestic abuse and the death occurs with extreme indifference to human life. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Sen. Doug Overbey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2013-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0140 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-26 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0392&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0392.pdf |