TN HB0391 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the industrial development division, building finance committee, June 30, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 14, Part 1 and Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, extends the industrial development division, building finance committee, June 30, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 14, Part 1 and Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0391&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0391.pdf |