TN HB0389 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of children's services to require a person receiving financial assistance for adoption from the department to provide verification from the adopted child's current medical or mental health professional provider or verification of full-time school enrollment from the school the child attends. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36 and Title 37, relative to adoption assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 163 | |
2021-04-05 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0270 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-30 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021