TN HB0385 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 193
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 193
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases the amount the superintendent of an urban type public facility may purchase without approval of the governing authority from $500 to $10,000 and increases the amount of construction contracts from $2,000 to $10,000 for which the superintendent must advertise for bids. - Amends TCA Section 5-16-105.
Title
As enacted, increases the amount the superintendent of an urban type public facility may purchase without approval of the governing authority from $500 to $10,000 and increases the amount of construction contracts from $2,000 to $10,000 for which the superintendent must advertise for bids. - Amends TCA Section 5-16-105.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-22 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-22 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 193 | |
2011-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/12/11 | |
2011-05-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-03 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-04-28 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-04-28 | Passed S., Ayes 23, Nays 4 | |
2011-04-28 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-03-31 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-03-28 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-03-28 | Passed H., Ayes 82, Nays 10, PNV 5 | |
2011-03-24 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2011 | |
2011-03-22 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/22/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/16/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0489 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 193