TN HB0372 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts "Ed's Law"; requires a juvenile accused of certain criminal offenses to be transferred from juvenile court to criminal court to be tried as an adult if the juvenile court finds probable cause that the juvenile committed the act. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 39, relative to "Ed's Law".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2023-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2023-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1113 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback