TN HB0368 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes records of minor students created by a school resource or other law enforcement officer confidential and not subject to a public records request in certain circumstances, from May 11, 2021 to July 1, 2026; creates certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5, relative to confidential records of minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 391 | |
2021-05-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-28 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-27 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 89, Nays 1 PNV 1 HB0368 |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to reconsider SA1 |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to lift from table nonconcurrance of SA1 |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/27/21 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from amendment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. SA1 HB0368 |
2021-04-14 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/15/21 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 4, PNV 1 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0168) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-30 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-29 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-03-29 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0104) |
2021-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1598 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 391