TN SB1598 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes records of minor students created by a school resource or other law enforcement officer confidential and not subject to a public records request in certain circumstances, from May 11, 2021 to July 1, 2026; creates certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5, relative to confidential records of minors.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 391 | |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0368 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021