TN HB0366 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the department of health, June 30, 2019, and requires the department to report back to the committee concerning the findings in its 2014 performance audit report. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, extends the department of health, June 30, 2019, and requires the department to report back to the committee concerning the findings in its 2014 performance audit report. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Pub. Ch. 18 | |
2015-04-01 | Effective date(s) 03/27/2015 | |
2015-03-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-03-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-17 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-03-12 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-03-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2015-03-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2015 |
2015-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0233 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 18