TN HB0366 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, bans all use of color printers by state agencies, departments and commissions with certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 56, Part 1; Title 12, Chapter 7 and Title 12, Chapter 5, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, bans all use of color printers by state agencies, departments and commissions with certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 56, Part 1; Title 12, Chapter 7 and Title 12, Chapter 5, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-07 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0366&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0366.pdf |