TN HB0347 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that a county judicial commissioner or magistrate may administer the oath of office to an elected or appointed official as authorized by a judge of the court or the county mayor. - Amends TCA Section 8-18-109.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies that a county judicial commissioner or magistrate may administer the oath of office to an elected or appointed official as authorized by a judge of the court or the county mayor. - Amends TCA Section 8-18-109.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-02-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2019
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019
2019-02-26HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-20HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
2019-02-04HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0345 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback