TN HB0341 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the sexual offenses for which a defendant is required to submit to an evaluation for and be subject to a standardized plan of sex offender treatment as part of the defendant's sentence. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 7, relative to standardized treatment for sex offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 365 | |
2021-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1126 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021