TN HB0340 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends period of time from 30 days to 30 business days for county legislative body to act on resolution or ordinance to levy one cent local gasoline tax following filing of petition with county legislative body to levy such tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, extends period of time from 30 days to 30 business days for county legislative body to act on resolution or ordinance to levy one cent local gasoline tax following filing of petition with county legislative body to levy such tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Transportation | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-07 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0570 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-14 - P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0340&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0340.pdf |