TN HB0338 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, adds healthcare services provided to a patient at a public elementary or secondary school to the current definition of telehealth services for which health insurance entities are required to reimburse in a manner that is consistent with reimbursement for in-person encounters; requires that the public elementary or secondary school be staffed by a healthcare service provider and equipped to engage in such services. - Amends TCA Title 56; Section 63-1-155 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, adds healthcare services provided to a patient at a public elementary or secondary school to the current definition of telehealth services for which health insurance entities are required to reimburse in a manner that is consistent with reimbursement for in-person encounters; requires that the public elementary or secondary school be staffed by a healthcare service provider and equipped to engage in such services. - Amends TCA Title 56; Section 63-1-155 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 130
2017-04-06HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-06HouseComp. SB subst.
2017-03-30HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/6/2017
2017-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2017
2017-03-28HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/28/2017
2017-03-22HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-15HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-03-14HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-08HousePlaced on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/14/2017
2017-03-08HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
2017-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/8/2017
2017-02-07HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-06HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
2017-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
2017-02-02HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-02HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-01HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0195 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 130

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback