TN SB0195 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, adds healthcare services provided to a patient at a public elementary or secondary school to the current definition of telehealth services for which health insurance entities are required to reimburse in a manner that is consistent with reimbursement for in-person encounters; requires that the public elementary or secondary school be staffed by a healthcare service provider and equipped to engage in such services. - Amends TCA Title 56; Section 63-1-155 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, adds healthcare services provided to a patient at a public elementary or secondary school to the current definition of telehealth services for which health insurance entities are required to reimburse in a manner that is consistent with reimbursement for in-person encounters; requires that the public elementary or secondary school be staffed by a healthcare service provider and equipped to engage in such services. - Amends TCA Title 56; Section 63-1-155 and Title 71.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19 Pub. Ch. 130
2017-04-19 Effective date(s) 04/17/2017
2017-04-17SenateSigned by Governor.
2017-04-11SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2017-04-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-04-10SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-04-07SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2017-04-06HousePassed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
2017-04-06HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0013)
2017-04-06HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2017-03-30HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2017-03-28SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-27SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2017-03-27SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2017-03-27SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0039)
2017-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/27/2017
2017-03-21SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/21/2017
2017-03-14SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2017
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2017
2017-02-14SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2017-02-08SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/14/2017
2017-02-02SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0338 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 130

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback