TN HB0334 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires department of safety to automatically register a qualified person to vote from information on an application for a driver license or photo identification card unless the person opts out; designates certain other state departments, and agencies and offices thereof, as voter registration agencies; requires such agencies to automatically register a qualified person to vote from information on an application for services unless the person opts out. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires department of safety to automatically register a qualified person to vote from information on an application for a driver license or photo identification card unless the person opts out; designates certain other state departments, and agencies and offices thereof, as voter registration agencies; requires such agencies to automatically register a qualified person to vote from information on an application for services unless the person opts out. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-20HouseAction Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 2/27/2019
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
2019-02-04HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0777 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback